NY S05230 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the "disaster preparedness and emergency planning act"; authorizes a local sales tax exemption for emergency preparedness supplies; requires the division of homeland security and emergency services, in conjunction with the department of taxation and finance, to establish, promote and publish on the web a list of eligible items.
Title
Creates the "disaster preparedness and emergency planning act"; authorizes a local sales tax exemption for emergency preparedness supplies; requires the division of homeland security and emergency services, in conjunction with the department of taxation and finance, to establish, promote and publish on the web a list of eligible items.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.965 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05302 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken