NY S05228 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to brownfield site cleanup; establishes environmental covenants; repeals provisions of law relating to brownfield redevelopment tax credits.
Title
Relates to brownfield site cleanup; establishes environmental covenants; repeals provisions of law relating to brownfield redevelopment tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2012-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1512 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5228A |
2012-01-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |