NY S05219 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5219A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5219A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for the replacement or repair of sewer lateral pipes by homeowners who use the home as their principal residence and have an income of less than two hundred fifty thousand dollars.
Title
Establishes a tax credit for the replacement or repair of sewer lateral pipes by homeowners who use the home as their principal residence and have an income of less than two hundred fifty thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5219A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A02537 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means