NY S05217 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Rescinds the anniversary day school holiday for the boroughs of Brooklyn and Queens.
Title
Rescinds the anniversary day school holiday for the boroughs of Brooklyn and Queens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.576 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.835 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01199 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education