NY S05208 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides accidental disability retirement benefits for deputy sheriff Richard Stueber, a participant in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, and cleanup operations.
Title
Provides accidental disability retirement benefits for deputy sheriff Richard Stueber, a participant in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, and cleanup operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5208A |
2024-03-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05067 (Same As) 2024-03-12 - print number 5067a