NY S05207 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the fingerprinting of prospective employees of approved private special education schools; phases in a requirement that all fingerprints submitted by prospective employees and applicants for certification be electronically submitted; strengthens identification verification practices for the purpose of conducting criminal history record checks and enhances existing statutory mechanisms to expedite the removal of persons who commit fingerprint fraud; makes permanent certain provisions relating to conditional clearances for employment.
Title
Relates to requiring the fingerprinting of prospective employees of approved private special education schools; phases in a requirement that all fingerprints submitted by prospective employees and applicants for certification be electronically submitted; strengthens identification verification practices for the purpose of conducting criminal history record checks and enhances existing statutory mechanisms to expedite the removal of persons who commit fingerprint fraud; makes permanent certain provisions relating to conditional clearances for employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1175 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06931 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education