NY S05198 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Hoosick Falls, county of Rensselaer, to issue certain bonds to reimburse the village for extraordinary expenses incurred in connection with the discovery of perfluorooctanoic acid (PFOA).
Title
Authorizes the village of Hoosick Falls, county of Rensselaer, to issue certain bonds to reimburse the village for extraordinary expenses incurred in connection with the discovery of perfluorooctanoic acid (PFOA).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.245 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.594 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6664 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.900 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06664 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5198