NY S05190 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting retail establishments including food-service establishments from refusing to accept payment in cash; provides a civil penalty will be assessed for such actions.
Title
Relates to prohibiting retail establishments including food-service establishments from refusing to accept payment in cash; provides a civil penalty will be assessed for such actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1021 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04512 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
A09811 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
A09811 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to consumer affairs and protection