NY S05188 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.511
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.511
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to retired members of the state police who have opted to make an application to obtain a license to carry or possess a firearm.
Title
Relates to retired members of the state police who have opted to make an application to obtain a license to carry or possess a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.511 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.390 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7598 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1387 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07598 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s5188