NY S05172 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization of St. Lawrence county to impose additional sales and compensating use taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authorization of St. Lawrence county to impose additional sales and compensating use taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-24 - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-24Assemblyreturned to senate
2015-06-24Assemblypassed assembly
2015-06-24Assemblyhome rule request
2015-06-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.410
2015-06-24Assemblysubstituted for a7678
2015-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2015-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-05-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2015-05-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2015-05-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.814
2015-05-06SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07678 (Same As) 2015-06-24 - substituted by s5172

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback