NY S05172 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4467A

Summary

Permits certain students enrolled in school, with parental consent, to serve as election inspectors or poll clerks at elections under the election or education law; such students, if so serving while school is in session, shall be recorded as in attendance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain students enrolled in school, with parental consent, to serve as election inspectors or poll clerks at elections under the election or education law; such students, if so serving while school is in session, shall be recorded as in attendance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-08 SUBSTITUTED BY A4467A
2010-03-04 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-03-03 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-03-02 1ST REPORT CAL.190
2010-01-20 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
2010-01-11 PRINT NUMBER 5172A
2010-01-11 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2010-01-06 REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2009-04-27 REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A4467-A (Same As) 2010-05-12 - signed chap.76

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback