NY S05171 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6371B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6371B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing pharmacists to refill non-controlled substance prescriptions for quantities of drugs not to exceed a ninety day supply.
Title
Relates to authorizing pharmacists to refill non-controlled substance prescriptions for quantities of drugs not to exceed a ninety day supply.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6371B |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1793 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5171B |
2017-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5171A |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06371 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - tabled