NY S05160 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A229C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that any plan of districting or redistricting relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; provides for standards to be followed for such plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that any plan of districting or redistricting relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; provides for standards to be followed for such plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A229C
2021-06-02SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1448
2021-06-02SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-25SenatePRINT NUMBER 5160B
2021-05-25SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2021-05-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 5160A
2021-05-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2021-02-25SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00229 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback