NY S05155 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any solicitation on behalf of a charitable organization shall include a statement clearly stating what percentage of the charity's proceeds are applied to such charity's stated mission.
Title
Provides that any solicitation on behalf of a charitable organization shall include a statement clearly stating what percentage of the charity's proceeds are applied to such charity's stated mission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.737 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08828 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations