NY S05155 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to retail sales on funds of the Industrial Development Agency.
Title
Relates to retail sales on funds of the Industrial Development Agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1183 |
2018-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5155B |
2018-01-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.792 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5155A |
2017-03-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07894 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - print number 7894a