NY S05153 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5153B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5153B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Title
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5153B |
2012-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5153A |
2011-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00344 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES