NY S05152 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits loan assignee liability with regard to motor vehicle retail installment contracts.
Title
Limits loan assignee liability with regard to motor vehicle retail installment contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.487 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.418 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8098 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1638 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08098 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5152