NY S05152 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to providing for an emergency technician 5 year re-certification program.
Title
Extends provisions relating to providing for an emergency technician 5 year re-certification program.
Sponsors
Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Hugh Farley [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7170 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1125 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07170 (Same As) 2013-06-30 - signed chap.78