NY S05152 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the owner of a rent regulated housing accommodation to evict a tenant, who is not 62 or older or disabled, for such owner's personal use and occupancy of the housing accommodation without an immediate and compelling necessity for such occupancy.
Title
Authorizes the owner of a rent regulated housing accommodation to evict a tenant, who is not 62 or older or disabled, for such owner's personal use and occupancy of the housing accommodation without an immediate and compelling necessity for such occupancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2012-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.603 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |