NY S05146 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5146C
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5146C
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the registration and regulation of pet groomers; establishes standards of care, training and testing; provides such applicant must be at least eighteen years of age.
Title
Provides for the registration and regulation of pet groomers; establishes standards of care, training and testing; provides such applicant must be at least eighteen years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5146C |
2018-05-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5146B |
2018-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-03-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5146A |
2017-03-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00284 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - amended on third reading (t) 284c