NY S05145 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the adoption registry; permits applications from persons born outside the state but adopted within the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the adoption registry; permits applications from persons born outside the state but adopted within the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.19
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.480
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.156
2012-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a8307
2012-05-22Assemblyreferred to health
2012-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.815
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2012-01-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-01-04Assemblydied in assembly
2011-06-13Assemblyreferred to health
2011-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-06-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2011-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2011-06-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.975
2011-05-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A08307 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s5145

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback