NY S05139 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits special proceedings against certain designated state officials to be commenced in a supreme court in the judicial district of the petitioner's residence or principal place of business; provides that a proceeding against the public service commission shall only be commenced in the supreme court, Albany county.
Title
Permits special proceedings against certain designated state officials to be commenced in a supreme court in the judicial district of the petitioner's residence or principal place of business; provides that a proceeding against the public service commission shall only be commenced in the supreme court, Albany county.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | vetoed memo.125 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1506 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5139 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.527 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-04 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6240 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1506 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06240 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - tabled