NY S05138 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to county, city, village or town commissions on human rights; adds additional human rights protections.
Title
Relates to county, city, village or town commissions on human rights; adds additional human rights protections.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.560 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.398 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7565 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.937 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07565 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.560