NY S05137 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account.
Title
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5137A |
2017-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05815 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO LABOR