NY S05127 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Webster, county of Monroe, to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Webster, county of Monroe, to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.135 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.576 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a6213a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5127A |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.565 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06213 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5127a