NY S05117 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the provision of critical incident mapping data with school safety plans.
Title
Authorizes the provision of critical incident mapping data with school safety plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.644 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05258 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - referred to education