NY S05114 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the approval of certain public authority contracts by the state comptroller.
Title
Relates to the approval of certain public authority contracts by the state comptroller.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02799 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means