NY S05114 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.282
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.282
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to creating a presumption of certain lung disabilities incurred by volunteer firefighters.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to creating a presumption of certain lung disabilities incurred by volunteer firefighters.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Foley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | SIGNED CHAP.282 | |
2010-07-19 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-23 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-23 | ordered to third reading rules cal.292 | |
2010-06-23 | substituted for a8516a | |
2010-06-18 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-06-18 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-18 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1035 | |
2010-06-15 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-09 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-17 | PRINT NUMBER 5114A | |
2010-05-17 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A8516 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - substituted by s5114a