NY S05109 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 5109A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 5109A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "construction insurance transparency act" to require insurers providing coverage for liability under the scaffold law to report, on an annual basis, to the superintendent of financial services relating to its finances and claims paid thereunder.
Title
Enacts the "construction insurance transparency act" to require insurers providing coverage for liability under the scaffold law to report, on an annual basis, to the superintendent of financial services relating to its finances and claims paid thereunder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5109A |
2018-01-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01855 (Same As) 2017-01-13 - referred to insurance