NY S05097 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5097A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5097A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive membership with Tier II status in the New York state teachers' retirement system to Lori Cohen.
Title
Grants retroactive membership with Tier II status in the New York state teachers' retirement system to Lori Cohen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5097A |
2020-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1147 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07631 (Same As) 2020-01-06 - enacting clause stricken
A09722 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - referred to governmental employees
A09722 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - referred to governmental employees