NY S05094 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5094A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5094A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Carl Spatola to receive a refund from the New York state teachers' retirement system due to overpayment.
Title
Authorizes Carl Spatola to receive a refund from the New York state teachers' retirement system due to overpayment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5094A |
2018-03-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08085 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - held for consideration in governmental employees