NY S05093 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to standards for fire hydrant systems; provides for periodic tests of such systems; requires records of such tests be maintained for a period of ten years.
Title
Relates to standards for fire hydrant systems; provides for periodic tests of such systems; requires records of such tests be maintained for a period of ten years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.819 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5093A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |