NY S05092 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9186A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the return of any identification materials to an individual upon release from custody.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the return of any identification materials to an individual upon release from custody.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A9186A
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1271
2024-04-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 5092A
2024-04-17SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2023-02-22SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A09186 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - signed chap.485

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback