NY S05090 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an eligible employee may take two weeks of paid leave through the paid family leave program and an additional two weeks of unpaid leave during any 52 week calendar period as a result of being a victim of domestic or sexual abuse.
Title
Provides that an eligible employee may take two weeks of paid leave through the paid family leave program and an additional two weeks of unpaid leave during any 52 week calendar period as a result of being a victim of domestic or sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.778 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5090A |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.640 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08472 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to labor