NY S05084 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of addiction and mental health services.
Title
Establishes the office of addiction and mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2022-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.862 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5084C |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.911 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5084B |
2021-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5084A |
2021-02-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A08379 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse