NY S05081 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to information provided to unlicensed or unregistered child day care providers by the office of children and family services; requires all applications for a license/registration to be available in several languages.
Title
Relates to information provided to unlicensed or unregistered child day care providers by the office of children and family services; requires all applications for a license/registration to be available in several languages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1860 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.553 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01860 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - signed chap.114