NY S05065 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows parents and legal guardians to work from home; allows flexible working arrangements during a public health emergency or state or local disaster emergency which closes schools or day care centers; defines terms; creates a rebuttable presumption that an employee can work remotely if such employee has done so for two consecutive pay periods or two weeks; creates a civil penalty for violations.
Title
Allows parents and legal guardians to work from home; allows flexible working arrangements during a public health emergency or state or local disaster emergency which closes schools or day care centers; defines terms; creates a rebuttable presumption that an employee can work remotely if such employee has done so for two consecutive pay periods or two weeks; creates a civil penalty for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2022-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.81 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.498 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08095 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - enacting clause stricken