NY S05061 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Otsego to impose an additional mortgage recording tax of 25 cents per $100 of principal debt or obligation.
Title
Authorizes the county of Otsego to impose an additional mortgage recording tax of 25 cents per $100 of principal debt or obligation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5061A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06059 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS