NY S05058 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of lead ammunition in the taking of wildlife on wildlife management areas, state forests, forest preserves, state parks or any other state-owned land that is open for hunting and on land contributing surface water to the New York city water supply.
Title
Prohibits the use of lead ammunition in the taking of wildlife on wildlife management areas, state forests, forest preserves, state parks or any other state-owned land that is open for hunting and on land contributing surface water to the New York city water supply.
Sponsors
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.590 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05728 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION