NY S05057 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5057B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5057B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the notification of impending emergencies by electric corporations to affected communities.
Title
Provides for the notification of impending emergencies by electric corporations to affected communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5057B | |
2010-03-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-03-25 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-03-24 | 1ST REPORT CAL.317 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2009-06-04 | PRINT NUMBER 5057A | |
2009-06-04 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A4482-A (Same As) 2010-07-01 - amended on third reading 4482b