NY S05056 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides restrictions on advertisement and promotion of electronic cigarettes; prohibits misrepresentations regarding health consequences; prohibits agreements which suppress research data regarding health consequences of vaping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides restrictions on advertisement and promotion of electronic cigarettes; prohibits misrepresentations regarding health consequences; prohibits agreements which suppress research data regarding health consequences of vaping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.875
2019-04-05SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A08141 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - referred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback