NY S05056 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides restrictions on advertisement and promotion of electronic cigarettes; prohibits misrepresentations regarding health consequences; prohibits agreements which suppress research data regarding health consequences of vaping.
Title
Provides restrictions on advertisement and promotion of electronic cigarettes; prohibits misrepresentations regarding health consequences; prohibits agreements which suppress research data regarding health consequences of vaping.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.875 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08141 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection