NY S05055 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to alternative finance investment bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to alternative finance investment bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO BANKS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyreferred to economic development
2023-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-02-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.422
2023-02-22SenateREFERRED TO BANKS

Same As/Similar To

A02013 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback