NY S05022 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5022C
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5022C
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.
Title
Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5022C |
2018-04-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5022B |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5022A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02317 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - RECOMMITTED TO INSURANCE