NY S05010 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities in the county of Rockland to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to such municipalities' annual tax levy in accordance with applicable law.
Title
Authorizes municipalities in the county of Rockland to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to such municipalities' annual tax levy in accordance with applicable law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.564 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01284 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation