NY S05006 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits farmers markets in state and local parks.
Title
Permits farmers markets in state and local parks.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2022-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.616 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1044 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |