NY S05002 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage Atlantic cod.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage Atlantic cod.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7855 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1197 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07855 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - signed chap.128