NY S04998 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts owners of farms and the owners of multiple dwellings from complying with the scaffold law in certain instances.
Title
Exempts owners of farms and the owners of multiple dwellings from complying with the scaffold law in certain instances.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2011-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01359 (Same As) 2012-05-08 - held for consideration in labor