NY S04981 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4981B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 4981B
2020-01-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4981A
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.589
2019-04-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06983 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 6983b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback