NY S04973 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Ramapo, county of Rockland to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from Cong Chasidei Bobov of Monsey.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Ramapo, county of Rockland to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from Cong Chasidei Bobov of Monsey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5677 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1056 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05677 (Same As) 2013-10-23 - signed chap.439